THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:18:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Keele and Lawrence US
2355 Keele St., Unit D1
Toronto Ontario M6M 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-729-9007
Fax: (416) 245-4008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dae-Gyun Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chung (CPSO#: 65205 )
Business Address: D1 - 2355 Keele Street
North York Ontario M6M 4A2
(416) 243-8487
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Keele and Lawrence US
2355 Keele St., Unit D1
Toronto Ontario M6M 4A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-729-9007
Fax: (416) 245-4008

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dae-Gyun Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chung (CPSO#: 65205 )
Business Address: D1 - 2355 Keele Street
North York Ontario M6M 4A2
(416) 243-8487
Business Address: 807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAE-GYUN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAE-GYUN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992