THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:19:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN, YUGOSLAV

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1695 Manning Rd
Suite 110
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-979-2235
Fax: (519) 979-4890
Address: 3920 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Phone: (519) 946-0123
Fax: (519) 946-0125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jezdic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2024

Corporation Name: Dusanka Jezdic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BOSNIAN, CROATIAN, SERBIAN, YUGOSLAV
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1695 Manning Rd
Suite 110
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-979-2235
Fax: (519) 979-4890
Address: 3920 Dougall Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9G 1X2
Phone: (519) 946-0123
Fax: (519) 946-0125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jezdic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Sep 2024

Corporation Name: Dusanka Jezdic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSANKA DONNA JEZDIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEZDIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUSANKA DONNA JEZDIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEZDIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992