THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1017 Wilson Ave. Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2727
Fax: (416) 438-2713
Address: Pediatric & Adolescent Gynecology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6189
Fax: (416) 813-6192

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1017 Wilson Ave. Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2727
Fax: (416) 438-2713
Address: Pediatric & Adolescent Gynecology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6189
Fax: (416) 813-6192

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLETTE CAMILLA CACCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACCIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLETTE CAMILLA CACCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACCIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992