THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:25:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Centre for Headache
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6136
Fax: (416) 323-6007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's College Hospital
Centre for Headache
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-6136
Fax: (416) 323-6007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LOUISE LAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE LOUISE LAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992