THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:03:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51The Parkway
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 319-7996
Fax: (613) 271-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dawson (CPSO#: 65376 )
Business Address: 51 The Parkway
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1T1
(613) 319-7996

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 51The Parkway
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 319-7996
Fax: (613) 271-8998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dawson (CPSO#: 65376 )
Business Address: 51 The Parkway
Ottawa Ontario K2K 1T1
(613) 319-7996

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN PATRICIA DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN PATRICIA DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992