THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Court Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-5411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 Court Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 4R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-5411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GREGORY CRYSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRYSLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GREGORY CRYSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRYSLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992