THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:26:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-2000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN SIMEON BAYLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN SIMEON BAYLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992