THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:57:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766 1162
Fax: (416) 766 0463
Address: 200 Elizabeth street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 4800
Extension: 4812
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6325
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Centre
Dept of Medicine
Division of Cardiology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4169936684
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Cardiology
Cardiac Cath lab
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 4169936684
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fisher (CPSO#: 65413 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
(416) 233-4242
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6325
Business Address: UHN
Toronto Western Site
399 Bathurst Street
3A Fell
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5184
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Cardiology
Cardiac Cath Lab
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4169936684

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 766 1162
Fax: (416) 766 0463
Address: 200 Elizabeth street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 4800
Extension: 4812
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6325
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Centre
Dept of Medicine
Division of Cardiology
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4169936684
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Cardiology
Cardiac Cath lab
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 4169936684
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Fisher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fisher (CPSO#: 65413 )
Business Address: 5 Junction Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 1B5
(416) 233-4242
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6325
Business Address: UHN
Toronto Western Site
399 Bathurst Street
3A Fell
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5184
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St Michael's Hospital
Cardiology
Cardiac Cath Lab
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
4169936684

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALEXANDER FISHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FISHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992