THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:35:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinical Neurological Sciences
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2926
Fax: (519) 663-2947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: duggal medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Raymond (CPSO#: 67043 ) Dr. N. Duggal (CPSO#: 65435 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
519 663 2926

Corporation Name: Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinical Neurological Sciences
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2926
Fax: (519) 663-2947

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: duggal medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Raymond (CPSO#: 67043 ) Dr. N. Duggal (CPSO#: 65435 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6G 2M3
519 663 2926

Corporation Name: Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Oct 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL DUGGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL DUGGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1999

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992