THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:00:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Hospital
30 The Queensway,
Sunnyside Wing, Rm 406
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 530-6759
Fax: 416 530-6482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, GREEK
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Josephs Hospital
30 The Queensway,
Sunnyside Wing, Rm 406
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 530-6759
Fax: 416 530-6482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIANNOULA KLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEMENT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GIANNOULA KLEMENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEMENT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992