THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:22:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Feb 2017
Summary of Decision:
On February 21, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nagi Nazmi Riad Ghabbour committed an act of professional misconduct in that, he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The College investigation began after Patient A’s mother complained to the College on May 25, 2015, alleging that Dr. Ghabbour was involved in a romantic relationship with Patient A.

Beginning in the summer of Year 1, Dr. Ghabbour was the treating psychiatrist for Patient A. Patient A was married with children. In the course of providing treatment to Patient A, Dr. Ghabbour wrote letters and filled out reports on her behalf to her employer and provided prescriptions to Patient A to help her deal with anxiety and depression. Dr. Ghabbour had one joint session with Patient A and her husband.

Over the course of her therapy appointments with Dr. Ghabbour, Patient A developed romantic feelings for him. In a final appointment in the late spring of Year 2, as recorded in the patient chart, Patient A confirmed that she wished to terminate the doctor-patient relationship. According to Patient A and Dr. Ghabbour, following the termination of the doctor-patient relationship, they began to date a couple of weeks later. Their relationship became sexually intimate approximately another two weeks later, according to Patient A, and approximately one month later, according to Dr. Ghabbour. They have lived together since early Year 3, and they plan to marry.

Dr. Ghabbour admitted and the Committee found that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On August 21, 2017 the Committee ordered and directed that:

- the Registrar revoke Dr. Ghabbour’s certificate of registration, effective immediately.
- Dr. Ghabbour appear before the panel to be reprimanded within three (3) months of this Order becoming final.
- Dr. Ghabbour pay costs to the College in the amount of $11,000.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order becoming final.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 21 & 22, 2017

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Feb 2017
Summary of Decision:
On February 21, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nagi Nazmi Riad Ghabbour committed an act of professional misconduct in that, he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The College investigation began after Patient A’s mother complained to the College on May 25, 2015, alleging that Dr. Ghabbour was involved in a romantic relationship with Patient A.

Beginning in the summer of Year 1, Dr. Ghabbour was the treating psychiatrist for Patient A. Patient A was married with children. In the course of providing treatment to Patient A, Dr. Ghabbour wrote letters and filled out reports on her behalf to her employer and provided prescriptions to Patient A to help her deal with anxiety and depression. Dr. Ghabbour had one joint session with Patient A and her husband.

Over the course of her therapy appointments with Dr. Ghabbour, Patient A developed romantic feelings for him. In a final appointment in the late spring of Year 2, as recorded in the patient chart, Patient A confirmed that she wished to terminate the doctor-patient relationship. According to Patient A and Dr. Ghabbour, following the termination of the doctor-patient relationship, they began to date a couple of weeks later. Their relationship became sexually intimate approximately another two weeks later, according to Patient A, and approximately one month later, according to Dr. Ghabbour. They have lived together since early Year 3, and they plan to marry.

Dr. Ghabbour admitted and the Committee found that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On August 21, 2017 the Committee ordered and directed that:

- the Registrar revoke Dr. Ghabbour’s certificate of registration, effective immediately.
- Dr. Ghabbour appear before the panel to be reprimanded within three (3) months of this Order becoming final.
- Dr. Ghabbour pay costs to the College in the amount of $11,000.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order becoming final.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 21 & 22, 2017

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992