THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:07:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 2442
Fax: (613) 961-2503
Address: 25 KING STREET WEST
Kingston Ontario K7L5P9
Phone: 6135442631
Extension: 4503
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Quinte Health Belleville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Extension: 2442
Fax: (613) 961-2503
Address: 25 KING STREET WEST
Kingston Ontario K7L5P9
Phone: 6135442631
Extension: 4503
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Quinte Health Belleville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992