THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University Central Del Este, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 6
315 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M4V 2H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 972-9273
Fax: (647) 494-4686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Masri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: University Central Del Este, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 6
315 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M4V 2H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 972-9273
Fax: (647) 494-4686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sam Masri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAM MASRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAM MASRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University Central Del Este, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992