THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:51:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
5668 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-2360
Fax: (905) 357-4714
Address: 5662 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z4
Phone: 905-357-2360
Fax: 905-357-4714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. B. Danial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jul 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
5668 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 357-2360
Fax: (905) 357-4714
Address: 5662 Main Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Z4
Phone: 905-357-2360
Fax: 905-357-4714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. B. Danial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jul 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH BADAR DANIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH BADAR DANIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1992