THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:56:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Le Bonheur Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
848 Adams Avenue
Memphis Tennessee 38103
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (901) 287-5909
Fax: (901) 287-5147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 May 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Tennessee
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Le Bonheur Children's Hospital
Department of Radiology
848 Adams Avenue
Memphis Tennessee 38103
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (901) 287-5909
Fax: (901) 287-5147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 May 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Tennessee
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN FRANKLIN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN FRANKLIN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Vanderbilt University, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1992