THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:14:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who wish to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Glen Hunter at the Milton Centre for Women’s Health at 905-875-2280
Date Received: 11 Mar 2021

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Peru

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who wish to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Glen Hunter at the Milton Centre for Women’s Health at 905-875-2280
Date Received: 11 Mar 2021

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Peru

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1992