THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montreal Chest Institute
MUHC
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal Quebec H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 934-1934
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 219 East Main Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Phone: (613) 632-4185
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1935 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8A3
Phone: (613) 521-2391
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montreal Chest Institute
MUHC
1001 Decarie Blvd
Montreal Quebec H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 934-1934
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 219 East Main Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Phone: (613) 632-4185
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1935 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8A3
Phone: (613) 521-2391
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD CHRYSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRYSLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD CHRYSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRYSLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1992