THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mesaros, Marianne (Used Until: 03 Jan 1996)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 8953174
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Mesaros, Marianne (Used Until: 03 Jan 1996)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SERBIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 8953174
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE MCKINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE MCKINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 1992