THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:06:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
683 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 254-7009
Fax: (705) 254-7856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
683 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 254-7009
Fax: (705) 254-7856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
11 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 11 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 11, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Inder Gupta in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gupta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. INDER GUPTA
(“Dr. Gupta”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Gupta, certificate of registration number 65963, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that the College has received information regarding my pacemaker practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake that I will not practice hospital-based cardiology, and will only practice cardiology in an office setting.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice or delegate, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Gupta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(12) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

The College received information regarding Dr. Gupta’s pacemaker practice. Dr. Gupta has agreed not to practice hospital-based cardiology and will only practice cardiology in an office setting.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Gupta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Gupta, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from June 11, 2024, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Inder Gupta in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gupta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. INDER GUPTA
(“Dr. Gupta”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;

“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;

“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Gupta, certificate of registration number 65963, am a member of the College.

(3) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that the College has received information regarding my pacemaker practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake that I will not practice hospital-based cardiology, and will only practice cardiology in an office setting.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice or delegate, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Gupta, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Gupta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).

(11) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.

(12) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(13) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Gupta, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

The College received information regarding Dr. Gupta’s pacemaker practice. Dr. Gupta has agreed not to practice hospital-based cardiology and will only practice cardiology in an office setting.

D. CONSENT

(14) I, Dr. Gupta, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Gupta, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Jun 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Inder Paul Gupta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 11, 2024:
 
The College received information regarding Dr. Gupta’s pacemaker practice. Dr. Gupta has agreed not to practice hospital-based cardiology and will only practice cardiology in an office setting.  

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Jun 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Inder Paul Gupta to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 11, 2024:
 
The College received information regarding Dr. Gupta’s pacemaker practice. Dr. Gupta has agreed not to practice hospital-based cardiology and will only practice cardiology in an office setting.  

Training

Medical School: Maharshi Dayanand University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1992