THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:56:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-5196
Fax: (905) 682-9317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagwa Takla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 682-5196
Fax: (905) 682-9317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagwa Takla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGWA ALBERT TAKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGWA ALBERT TAKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 1992