THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 19:32:47 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TAMIL, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 8
2140 Regent Street south
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7251
Fax: (705) 523-7261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Ravi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, TAMIL, URDU
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 8
2140 Regent Street south
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7251
Fax: (705) 523-7261

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Ravi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAMA DORASWAMY RAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAMA DORASWAMY RAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 1992