THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:35:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LASIK MD
First Canadian Place
100 King Street West Suite 120
M5X 2A1
Toronto Ontario M5X2A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-0266
Fax: 416-646-0270
Address: LASIK MD
5025 Orbiter Drive 3rd floor
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4Y5
Phone: 416-362-8677
Fax: 416-626-0270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LASIK MD
First Canadian Place
100 King Street West Suite 120
M5X 2A1
Toronto Ontario M5X2A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-646-0266
Fax: 416-646-0270
Address: LASIK MD
5025 Orbiter Drive 3rd floor
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4Y5
Phone: 416-362-8677
Fax: 416-626-0270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVI WALLERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLERSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVI WALLERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Apr 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Apr 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 1992