THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:26:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2231 Armcrescent West Avenue
Halifax Nova Scotia B3L 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9024832191
Fax: 9027971177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2231 Armcrescent West Avenue
Halifax Nova Scotia B3L 3E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9024832191
Fax: 9027971177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH JEFFERY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH JEFFERY COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Aug 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 1993