THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 06:04:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 02 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 17 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 02 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 02 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN TAHIR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN TAHIR QURESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QURESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 1993