THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:43:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: Graham, Jennifer Michelle (Used Until: 21 Apr 2004)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Temmy Latner Centre for
Pallative Care
60 Murray St., L4-000, Box 13
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Graham, Jennifer Michelle (Used Until: 21 Apr 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Temmy Latner Centre for
Pallative Care
60 Murray St., L4-000, Box 13
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE ARVANITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARVANITIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE ARVANITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARVANITIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993