THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:13:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: Geffen, Allison Sigal (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Geffen, Allison Sigal (Used Until: 22 Nov 1998)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-3029 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 8E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-0978
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: Geffen, Allison Sigal (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Geffen, Allison Sigal (Used Until: 22 Nov 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-3029 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 8E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-0978
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON SIGAL GEFFEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEFFEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON SIGAL GEFFEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEFFEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993