THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:28:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: (416) 743-1358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: (416) 743-1358

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MARA ENGLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLISH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MARA ENGLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGLISH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993