THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:07:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Address: 95 Bayly St W
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: 416-284-0141
Address: 202-1105 Kingston Rd
# 200A
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: 416-284-0141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saleem Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Address: 95 Bayly St W
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: 416-284-0141
Address: 202-1105 Kingston Rd
# 200A
Pickering ON L1V 1B5
Phone: 416-284-4744
Fax: 416-284-0141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saleem Kassam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALEEM AMIRALI KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALEEM AMIRALI KASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993