THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gastrointestinal Endoscopy Unit
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 308
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 242-7783
Fax: (416) 242-7672
Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 17 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gastrointestinal Endoscopy Unit
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Extension: 21600
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 308
1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 242-7783
Fax: (416) 242-7672
Address: Suite 200
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: (905) 856-2626
Fax: (905) 856-2602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 17 Nov 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC WAN HAY LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC WAN HAY LEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993