THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:47:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.S. Chypchar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T.S. Chypchar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 May 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 May 2003

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 May 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993