THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 20:05:05 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Johanna Mugford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Johanna Mugford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNA LYNN MUGFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUGFORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNA LYNN MUGFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUGFORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993