THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:48:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 77240
Fax: (613) 739-6267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 77240
Fax: (613) 739-6267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 10 Sep 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Sep 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIRGINIA RUTH ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIRGINIA RUTH ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993