THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Point Walk In Clinic
9368 South Fort Drive
Fort Saskatchewan Alberta T8L 0C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 780 400 8674
Fax: (780) 669-3979
Address: 9368 Southfort Drive
Fort Saskatchewan Alberta T8L0C5
Phone: 780 400 8674
Fax: 780997 0177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Point Walk In Clinic
9368 South Fort Drive
Fort Saskatchewan Alberta T8L 0C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 780 400 8674
Fax: (780) 669-3979
Address: 9368 Southfort Drive
Fort Saskatchewan Alberta T8L0C5
Phone: 780 400 8674
Fax: 780997 0177

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR FAROOQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1997
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993