THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 311
Ocala Florida 34478-0311
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 617-584-1969
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 09 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 311
Ocala Florida 34478-0311
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 617-584-1969
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 09 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAGUN KAUR TULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAGUN KAUR TULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993