THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:39:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wurzburg, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 830 Dixon Rd
Clearpoint Surgical
Department of Anesthesia
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 5Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 441 2111
Fax: 416 441 2114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
France
Germany
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Wurzburg, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 830 Dixon Rd
Clearpoint Surgical
Department of Anesthesia
Etobicoke Ontario M9W 5Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 441 2111
Fax: 416 441 2114

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
France
Germany
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHIAS MARCUS KURREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURREK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHIAS MARCUS KURREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURREK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wurzburg, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993