THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2211 Riverside Drive
Suite 402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 897 1444
Fax: (613) 482 4690
Address: University of Ottawa Institute
of Mental Health Research
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6718
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2211 Riverside Drive
Suite 402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 897 1444
Fax: (613) 482 4690
Address: University of Ottawa Institute
of Mental Health Research
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 6718
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANNE DAVIDA TALBOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALBOT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANNE DAVIDA TALBOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALBOT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993