THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: Russell-Mahoney, Barbara Lynn (Used Until: 06 Jun 2022) Russell, Barbara Lynn (Used Until: 21 Aug 2003)
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7910 112 Ave NW
Edmonton AB T5B 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7803424740
Fax: 7803424745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: Russell-Mahoney, Barbara Lynn (Used Until: 06 Jun 2022) Russell, Barbara Lynn (Used Until: 21 Aug 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7910 112 Ave NW
Edmonton AB T5B 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7803424740
Fax: 7803424745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA LYNN RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARBARA LYNN RUSSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSSELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 1995

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1995
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1993