THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:01:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gurcharan S. Syan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gurcharan S. Syan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Nov 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gurcharan Singh Syan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 12, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Syan engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his cardiology and internal medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Syan entered into an Undertaking dated January 11, 2019, whereby he agreed to provide outpatient care only and to engage in professional education and medical record keeping and communication. The ICRC also delivered a caution in person.

Instead of completing outstanding aspects of the professional education, the ICRC has accepted that Dr. Syan voluntarily restrict his practice to interpreting and reporting diagnostic testing and that he engage in workplace monitoring for one year. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Nov 2019
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Jan 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 12 Nov 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gurcharan Singh Syan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 12, 2020:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Syan engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his cardiology and internal medicine practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Syan entered into an Undertaking dated January 11, 2019, whereby he agreed to provide outpatient care only and to engage in professional education and medical record keeping and communication. The ICRC also delivered a caution in person.

Instead of completing outstanding aspects of the professional education, the ICRC has accepted that Dr. Syan voluntarily restrict his practice to interpreting and reporting diagnostic testing and that he engage in workplace monitoring for one year. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Nov 2019
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Jan 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: Punjabi University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993