THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:54:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 20 Burkebrook Place
Unit 406
Toronto, ON M4G 0A1
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 20 Burkebrook Place
Unit 406
Toronto, ON M4G 0A1
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 03 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1993