THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:04:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B 1100 Medical Center North
Department of OB/GYN
Maternal -Fetal -Medicine
Vanderbilt University
Nashville Tennessee 37232
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (615) 343-6275
Fax: (615) 343-8881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Tennessee

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B 1100 Medical Center North
Department of OB/GYN
Maternal -Fetal -Medicine
Vanderbilt University
Nashville Tennessee 37232
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (615) 343-6275
Fax: (615) 343-8881

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Tennessee

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY ANGELA BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY ANGELA BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 01 Feb 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1993