THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: Dunstan, Karen Joy (Used Until: 08 Dec 2009)
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Argentia Road
West Mississauga Medical
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057853627
Fax: 9057853628
Address: 2980 Crosscurrent Drive
Mississauga Medical Arts
Unit 6
Mississauga Ontario L5N 7C7
Phone: 9052885900
Fax: 9057853628

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Dunstan, Karen Joy (Used Until: 08 Dec 2009)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Argentia Road
West Mississauga Medical
Mississauga Ontario L5N 8E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057853627
Fax: 9057853628
Address: 2980 Crosscurrent Drive
Mississauga Medical Arts
Unit 6
Mississauga Ontario L5N 7C7
Phone: 9052885900
Fax: 9057853628

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN JOY RACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN JOY RACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RACE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Incapacity referral to Fitness to Practise Committee
Date of Decision: 19 Apr 2004
Summary of Decision:
On April 19, 2004, the Fitness to Practice Committee ordered:

1. The Registrar to remove the suspension imposed by the Executive Committee under s.62 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Profesions Act, 1991; and,

2.This matter be resolved on the basis of the Undertaking dated January 20, 2004, and as amended February 7, 2007, and signed by Dr. Dunstan by which it is agreed that the following is a term, condition and limitation on her certificate of registration:

I may only practise pursuant to the terms of my Contract with the Physician Health Program and my undertaking with the College.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Apr 2004

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Proceeding Type: Incapacity referral to Fitness to Practise Committee
Date of Decision: 19 Apr 2004
Summary of Decision:
On April 19, 2004, the Fitness to Practice Committee ordered:

1. The Registrar to remove the suspension imposed by the Executive Committee under s.62 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Profesions Act, 1991; and,

2.This matter be resolved on the basis of the Undertaking dated January 20, 2004, and as amended February 7, 2007, and signed by Dr. Dunstan by which it is agreed that the following is a term, condition and limitation on her certificate of registration:

I may only practise pursuant to the terms of my Contract with the Physician Health Program and my undertaking with the College.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Apr 2004

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 23 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 07 Feb 2007
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 19 Apr 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2007

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1993