THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:36:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mosul, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, KURDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Care Group
Department of Psychiatry
35 N. Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 343-4317
Fax: (807) 345-4994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, KURDI
Medical School: University of Mosul, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Care Group
Department of Psychiatry
35 N. Algoma Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 343-4317
Fax: (807) 345-4994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIWAN HASSAN HUSNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIWAN HASSAN HUSNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mosul, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2004

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 1993