THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:11:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pavillon CHUL TR-93
2705 boulevard Laurier
Quebec City Quebec G1V 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (418) 654-2178
Fax: (418) 654-2142

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pavillon CHUL TR-93
2705 boulevard Laurier
Quebec City Quebec G1V 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (418) 654-2178
Fax: (418) 654-2142

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Dec 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Fortin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2012

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH-ROBERT FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOSEPH-ROBERT FORTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1993