THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:38:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
307A Bridge Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 409-8888
Fax: (613) 409-8889
Address: Lennox & Addington County Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
307A Bridge Street West
Napanee Ontario K7R 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 409-8888
Fax: (613) 409-8889
Address: Lennox & Addington County Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee Ontario K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
14 Nov 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 14 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from November 14, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. King Wi Andre Tan, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tan to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Tan will limit his practice to a community-based ENT practice in a
non-tertiary setting; will limit the procedures he performs under general
anaesthetic to the procedures included in the list attached as Schedule
"A"; and has voluntarily agreed not to have on-call responsibilities at
any clinic or hospital.

SCHEDULE "A" TO THE UNDERTAKING OF DR. KING WI ANDRE TAN
TO THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
General Septoplasty
Anesthesia
Rhinoplasty +/- nasal valve reconstruction
Turbinate Reduction
Nasal Mass Biopsy
Septal Perforation Repair
Septodermal Grafting
Myringoplasty
Tympanoplasty
Myringotomy and Tubes
Foreign Body Removal of Nose
Foreign Body Removal of Ears
Micro-laryngoscopy and Biopsy
Submandibular Gland Exercision
Removal of Salivary Stone
Neck Node Biopsy
Uvuloplasty (UPPP)
Tonsillectomy and / or Adenoidectomy
Routine/Pre-planned tracheostomy in chronically ventilated
patients
Minor Oral Lesion Removal or Biopsy
Endoscopic Sinus Surgery
MAC Facial Skin Lesion Resection
Facial Defect Reconstruction (include grafts and local flaps)
Facial Scar Revision







VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

As from November 14, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. King Wi Andre Tan, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tan to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Tan will limit his practice to a community-based ENT practice in a
non-tertiary setting; will limit the procedures he performs under general
anaesthetic to the procedures included in the list attached as Schedule
"A"; and has voluntarily agreed not to have on-call responsibilities at
any clinic or hospital.

SCHEDULE "A" TO THE UNDERTAKING OF DR. KING WI ANDRE TAN
TO THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
General Septoplasty
Anesthesia
Rhinoplasty +/- nasal valve reconstruction
Turbinate Reduction
Nasal Mass Biopsy
Septal Perforation Repair
Septodermal Grafting
Myringoplasty
Tympanoplasty
Myringotomy and Tubes
Foreign Body Removal of Nose
Foreign Body Removal of Ears
Micro-laryngoscopy and Biopsy
Submandibular Gland Exercision
Removal of Salivary Stone
Neck Node Biopsy
Uvuloplasty (UPPP)
Tonsillectomy and / or Adenoidectomy
Routine/Pre-planned tracheostomy in chronically ventilated
patients
Minor Oral Lesion Removal or Biopsy
Endoscopic Sinus Surgery
MAC Facial Skin Lesion Resection
Facial Defect Reconstruction (include grafts and local flaps)
Facial Scar Revision







Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1993