THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:08:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Spine Road
St Joseph's General Hospital
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 848-7181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Ohio
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 Spine Road
St Joseph's General Hospital
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 848-7181
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Ohio
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's General Hospital Elliot Lake
LOCATION: Elliot Lake

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WALTER FREDERICK JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID WALTER FREDERICK JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 1993