THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:15:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.K.T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.K.T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jan 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 07 Sep 2016
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Lee’s professional misconduct have been referred to to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Lee engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct and/or sexual abuse of a patient including engaging in a personal relationship with the patient, engaging in sexual actions involving the patient, making inappropriate personal disclosures to the patient during the doctor-patient relationship and engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct during the College investigation. It is also alleged that Dr. Lee failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and was incompetent in his care and treatment of the patient.

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 07 Sep 2016
Summary:
Allegations of Dr. Lee’s professional misconduct have been referred to to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Lee engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct and/or sexual abuse of a patient including engaging in a personal relationship with the patient, engaging in sexual actions involving the patient, making inappropriate personal disclosures to the patient during the doctor-patient relationship and engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct during the College investigation. It is also alleged that Dr. Lee failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and was incompetent in his care and treatment of the patient.

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 05 Nov 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1993