THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:14:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RPO Countryside
PO BOX 30119
Brampton Ontario L6R 0S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 791-9970
Fax: (905) 791-6082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients who wish to obtain a copy of their record may either send a fax to 905-791-6082, or write to:
RPO Countryside
P.O. Box 30119
Brampton ON L6R 0S9
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - New York
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: RPO Countryside
PO BOX 30119
Brampton Ontario L6R 0S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 791-9970
Fax: (905) 791-6082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Patients who wish to obtain a copy of their record may either send a fax to 905-791-6082, or write to:
RPO Countryside
P.O. Box 30119
Brampton ON L6R 0S9
Date Received: 26 Sep 2019

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Florida
USA - New York
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIDAR SINGH SARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIDAR SINGH SARAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1993
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1993