THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:29:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Nephrology
585 University Ave
Suite 11PMB 188
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4084
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Nephrology
585 University Ave
Suite 11PMB 188
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4084
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Apr 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 23 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Istvan Mucsi may practise medicine independently in nephrology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Istvan Mucsi may practise medicine independently in nephrology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 May 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1994
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 May 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1994