THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:31:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Tannery Street East
2 Tannery St East
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192408564
Fax: 2268392585
Address: 3210 Harvester Rd
ONE Fertility
Burlington ON L7N 3T1
Phone: 9056344440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13069 Keele St
King City ON L7B 1G1
Phone: 9055399333
Fax: 9055391964

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Mueller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mueller (CPSO#: 67803 )
Business Address: 3210 Harvester Rd
ONE Fertility
Burlington ON L7N 3T1
9056344440
Business Address: 2 Tannery Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2B9
519-240-8564
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Tannery Street East
2 Tannery St East
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192408564
Fax: 2268392585
Address: 3210 Harvester Rd
ONE Fertility
Burlington ON L7N 3T1
Phone: 9056344440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13069 Keele St
King City ON L7B 1G1
Phone: 9055399333
Fax: 9055391964

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Mueller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mueller (CPSO#: 67803 )
Business Address: 3210 Harvester Rd
ONE Fertility
Burlington ON L7N 3T1
9056344440
Business Address: 2 Tannery Street East
Cambridge Ontario N3C 2B9
519-240-8564
Business Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE MARGARET LAIDLAW MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VALERIE MARGARET LAIDLAW MUELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUELLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994