THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:38:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mehra, Michelle Kiran (Used Until: 10 Sep 1996)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Elizabeth Street
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Medicine
PSC 11-14
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168137654
Extension: 405660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Mehra, Michelle Kiran (Used Until: 10 Sep 1996)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Elizabeth Street
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Medicine
PSC 11-14
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168137654
Extension: 405660
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE KIRAN SHOULDICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOULDICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE KIRAN SHOULDICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOULDICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1994